Reports for Nescens Genolier SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nescens Genolier SA
- Nescens Genolier SA with its legal headquarters in Genolier is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities». Nescens Genolier SA is active.
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 13.09.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-115.116.994.
- Companies with the same address as Nescens Genolier SA: Laboratoires Genolier SA, NESCENS SA.
Management (9)
newest board members
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Michel Henri Reybier,
Antoine Maurice Hubert,
Raymond Charles Jacques Marie Loretan,
Antoine Pierre Kohler
newest authorized signatories
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Philipp Marc Gasche,
Pietro Fabrizio,
Babs Chantal Gabrielle Siclet,
Séverine Danièle Vanderschueren
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genolier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.061.239-1
UID/VAT
CHE-115.116.994
CHE-440.413.184 VAT
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'établissements sanitaires, médicalisés ou sécurisés tels qu'établissements de soins, d'accueil ou de bien-être, centre médicaux, permanences, maisons de retraite, cliniques de réadaptation, centres de prévention ou de diagnostic, organisations de soins à domicile; elle peut également fournir des services et conseils en matière de gestion et d'administration dans le secteur de la santé (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 23.07.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Les Hauts de Genolier SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nescens Genolier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006129557, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Nescens Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-115.116.994 (FOSC du 29.11.2021, p. 0/1005344872). La signature de Haenni Pierre Olivier est radiée. Siclet Babs est maintenant de Pully, à Bourg-en-Lavaux. Vanderschueren Séverine est maintenant de Genolier. Zumbrunnen Fabrice, de Aeschi bei Spiez, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005344872, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Nescens Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-115.116.994 (FOSC du 04.08.2020, p. 0/1004951508). La signature de Jandric Daniel est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1004951508, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Nescens Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-115.116.994 (FOSC du 26.09.2019, p. 0/1004724879). La signature de Donzel Julien est radiée. Fabrizio Pietro est maintenant de Prez.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.