Reports for Laboratoires Genolier SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Laboratoires Genolier SA
- Laboratoires Genolier SA from Genolier operates in the sector «Research and development» and is active.
- The management of the company Laboratoires Genolier SA consists of 6 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 30.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.409.531.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Nescens Genolier SA, NESCENS SA.
Management (6)
newest board members
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Michel Henri Reybier,
Antoine Maurice Hubert,
Jacques Proust
newest authorized signatories
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Séverine Danièle Vanderschueren,
Michel Henri Reybier,
Guillaume Dominick Albert Charles Vanthier,
Antoine Maurice Hubert
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.07.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genolier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-660.6.549.008-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.409.531
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes activités de développement et de commercialisation de produits cosméceutiques, cosmétiques et dérivés, ainsi que tout autre produit ayant pour trait la prévention du vieillissement.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 30.08.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
2C2F, CABINET DE CONSEIL FISCAL ET FIDUCIAIRE SA | Collonge-Bellerive | 15.07.2008 | 24.11.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SCPA - Swiss Centre for the Prevention of Aging Ltd
- Laboratoires Genolier - CSPV Genève SA
- CSPV - Centre Suisse de Prévention du Vieillissement SA
- Centre suisse de prévention du vieillissement SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Laboratoires Genolier SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006118695, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laboratoires Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-114.409.531 (FOSC du 20.09.2021, p. 0/1005294890). Vanderschueren Séverine est maintenant de Genolier. Zumbrunnen Fabrice, de Aeschi bei Spiez, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux. Radiation de la mention relative à la renonciation à l'organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
Berney Associés Audit SA (CHE-102.136.421), à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005294890, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laboratoires Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-114.409.531 (FOSC du 12.07.2021, p. 0/1005246989). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Vanderschueren Séverine, de Belgique, à Genolier.
Publication number: HR02-1005246989, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Laboratoires Genolier SA, à Genolier, CHE-114.409.531 (FOSC du 29.09.2020, p. 0/1004988466). Statuts modifiés le 29.06.2021. Capital-actions réduit d'un montant de CHF 866'700 par destruction d'actions et simultanément augmenté en espèces et par compensation de créances d'un montant de CHF 4'500'000;
en contrepartie, il est remis 4'500'000 actions de CHF 1.
Nouveau capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 6'000'000, divisé en 6'000'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts. Haenni Pierre Olivier n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Reybier Michel, de France, à Coppet, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.