Reports for NESCENS SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NESCENS SA
- NESCENS SA from Genolier operates in the sector «Leasing of intangible assets» and is active.
- The management of the company NESCENS SA, which was founded on the 19.10.2011, consists of 5 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 02.09.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-411.645.278.
- At the moment, the company NESCENS SA has 4 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Laboratoires Genolier SA, Nescens Genolier SA.
Management (5)
newest board members
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Jacques Proust,
Antoine Maurice Hubert,
Michel Henri Reybier
newest authorized signatories
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Séverine Danièle Vanderschueren,
Jacques Proust,
Antoine Maurice Hubert,
Michel Henri Reybier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.10.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genolier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-660.2.832.011-1
UID/VAT
CHE-411.645.278
Sector
Leasing of intangible assets
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la gestion de la marque "NESCENS" sous toutes ses formes, notamment via l'exploitation de centres de médecine préventive et la licence de la marque "NESCENS" à des spas, centres de soins, centres esthétiques, centre de médecine esthétique ainsi que centres de médecine préventive. La société a également pour but la prise de participations à toutes entreprises poursuivant une activité commerciale, industrielle ou financière en Suisse ou à l'étranger, ainsi que toutes autres activités de nature à promouvoir ou à développer le but précité ou à en faciliter la réalisation, en particulier dans le domaine des soins, de la santé et des produits cosméceutiques, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE). La société peut: exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties de toutes sortes à des actionnaires, des sociétés du groupe ou des tiers.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 25.11.2014 | 01.10.2020 | |
2C2F, CABINET DE CONSEIL FISCAL ET FIDUCIAIRE SA | Collonge-Bellerive | 24.10.2011 | 24.11.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
27.08.2024 | active | 08530/2024 | |
26.07.2024 | active | 08528/2024 |
Newest SOGC notifications: NESCENS SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006119759, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
NESCENS SA, à Genolier, CHE-411.645.278 (FOSC du 08.11.2021, p. 0/1005329135). La signature de Haenni Pierre Olivier est radiée. Vanderschueren Séverine est maintenant de Genolier. Zumbrunnen Fabrice, de Aeschi bei Spiez, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005329135, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
NESCENS SA, à Genolier, CHE-411.645.278 (FOSC du 20.09.2021, p. 0/1005294903). Statuts modifiés le 28.10.2021.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but la gestion de la marque "NESCENS" sous toutes ses formes, notamment via l'exploitation de centres de médecine préventive et la licence de la marque "NESCENS" à des spas, centres de soins, centres esthétiques, centre de médecine esthétique ainsi que centres de médecine préventive. La société a également pour but la prise de participations à toutes entreprises poursuivant une activité commerciale, industrielle ou financière en Suisse ou à l'étranger, ainsi que toutes autres activités de nature à promouvoir ou à développer le but précité ou à en faciliter la réalisation, en particulier dans le domaine des soins, de la santé et des produits cosméceutiques, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE).
La société peut:
exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties de toutes sortes à des actionnaires, des sociétés du groupe ou des tiers.
Publication number: HR02-1005294903, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
NESCENS SA, à Genolier, CHE-411.645.278 (FOSC du 12.07.2021, p. 0/1005246995). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Vanderschueren Séverine, de Belgique, à Genolier.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.