Pietro Fabrizio
domiciled in Marsens, from Prez Active mandates: Swiss Medical Network GesundheitsZentrum AG, Swiss Visio SA and more Connected persons: Fabrice Zumbrunnen, Nina Salvisberg, Séverine Danièle Vanderschueren and more You can stay up to date through "Pietro Fabrizio", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pietro Fabrizio"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pietro Fabrizio", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pietro Fabrizio"
|
Places where people with the name Pietro Fabrizio live
Sectors in which people with the name Pietro Fabrizio work
Operation of medical and dental practices
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Operation of investment companies
Sport services
Services regarding management consulting
Business management and administration
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Operation of hospitals
Operation of medical and dental practices
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Operation of investment companies
Sport services
Services regarding management consulting
Business management and administration
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Operation of hospitals
Private persons with the name Pietro Fabrizio
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pietro Fabrizio
Publication number: HR02-1006118531, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Swiss Medical Network GesundheitsZentrum AG, in Reinach (AG), CHE-156.871.450, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2023, Publ. 1005851204).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loretan, Raymond, von Leukerbad, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Greuter, Christian, von Zürich, in Wallisellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hubert, Antoine, von Orsières, in Lens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fabrizio, Pietro, von Prez, in Marsens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zumbrunnen, Fabrice, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in La Chaux-de-Fonds, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005908646, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Medizinisches Zentrum VIVA AG, in Ostermundigen, CHE-345.039.477, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2023, Publ. 1005845483).
Statutenänderung:
01.12.2023.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 200'000.00 [bisher: CHF 1'700'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 200'000.00 [bisher: CHF 1'700'000.00].
Aktien neu:
200'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 1'700'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00]. Bei der Kapitalherabsetzung vom 01.12.2023 werden 1'700'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 zur teilweisen Beseitigung einer Unterbilanz vernichtet. Gleichzeitig werden bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 01.12.2023 200'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 ausgegeben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cauzza, Dino, von Linescio, in Cugnasco (Cugnasco-Gerra), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fabrizio, Pietro, von Prez, in Marsens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Loretan, Raymond, von Leukerbad, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005781635, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Physiotherapie Solothurn AG, in Solothurn, CHE-107.601.129, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2016, Publ. 3001507).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cauzza, Dino, von Linescio, in Cugnasco-Gerra, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fabrizio, Pietro, von Prez, in Marsens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schaafsma, Ids Arjen, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schaafsma-Aeberhard, Kathrin, von Urtenen-Schönbühl, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].