Reports for Sunstar SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sunstar SA
- Sunstar SA is active in the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Etoy.
- The management of the company Sunstar SA, which was founded on the 28.01.2004, consists of 4 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 09.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.505.733.
- View all information about the 6 trademarks registered by the company Sunstar SA.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Hosei Gijuku Association, HOSEI GIJUKU LUXEMBOURG S.A., Luxembourg, succursale d'Etoy, S - RAS SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Etoy
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.037.842-3
UID/VAT
CHE-110.505.733
CHE-298.415.868 VAT
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'acquisition, la détention, l'administration et l'aliénation de participations dans d'autres sociétés à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 04.11.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Lausanne | 06.03.2007 | 03.11.2020 | |
KPMG SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 05.03.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sunstar AG
- Sunstar Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
17.08.2012 | active | 54568/2012 | |
18.06.2010 | active | 51579/2010 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Sunstar SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005881331, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar SA, à Etoy, CHE-110.505.733 (FOSC du 20.09.2022, p. 0/1005565428). Okamoto Yuji n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Yamane Kazuo n'est plus délégué. Katsura Seiji, du Japon, à Nagaokakyo City (Japon), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005565428, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar SA, à Etoy, CHE-110.505.733 (FOSC du 06.07.2022, p. 0/1005514338). Les signatures de Ducamp Olivier et Nötzold Wieland sont radiées.
Publication number: HR02-1005514338, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar SA, à Etoy, CHE-110.505.733 (FOSC du 01.07.2021, p. 0/1005236259). Taki Yukio n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Yamane Kazuo est nommé délégué. Okamoto Yuji, du Japon, à Morges, est membre délégué du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.