Reports for Sunstar Europe SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sunstar Europe SA
- Sunstar Europe SA from Etoy operates in the sector «Trading with various goods» and is active.
- The management of the company Sunstar Europe SA, which was founded on the 12.12.2011, consists of 5 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 25.06.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-288.629.764.
- Companies with the same address as Sunstar Europe SA: Hosei Gijuku Association, HOSEI GIJUKU LUXEMBOURG S.A., Luxembourg, succursale d'Etoy, S - RAS SA.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jörg Hinderer,
René Bujard,
Gavin Christopher Dale,
Marco Bruscaini,
Marco Pontello
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.12.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Etoy
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.101.642-6
UID/VAT
CHE-288.629.764
CHE-298.415.868 VAT
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la fabrication, le commerce et la distribution de tous matériaux, produits, appareils et équipements, ainsi que tout service s'y rapportant (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 06.10.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Lausanne | 15.12.2011 | 05.10.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sunstar Europe Ltd
- Sunstar Europe AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sunstar Europe SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006066853, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Europe SA, à Etoy, CHE-288.629.764 (FOSC du 10.10.2023, p. 0/1005857266). Procuration collective à deux est conférée à Bujard René, de Lutry, à Collex-Bossy, et Hinderer Jörg, de Milvignes, à Dully.
Publication number: HR02-1005857266, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Europe SA, à Etoy, CHE-288.629.764 (FOSC du 07.07.2022, p. 0/1005515646). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Dale Gavin, de et à Blonay - Saint-Légier.
Publication number: HR02-1005838398, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Europe SA, à Etoy, CHE-288.629.764 (FOSC du 07.07.2022, p. 0/1005515646). La signature de Linz Julia est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.