Reports for Sunstar Suisse SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sunstar Suisse SA
- Sunstar Suisse SA from Etoy operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods» and is active.
- The management has 11 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.907.042.
- There are currently 4 trademarks or applications for the company Sunstar Suisse SA in the IPI database.
Management (11)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
René Bujard,
Jörg Hinderer,
Yohei Hamasaki,
Christine Truillet,
Marco Bruscaini
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.10.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Etoy
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.031.419-8
UID/VAT
CHE-109.907.042
CHE-298.415.868 VAT
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Production, commerce et distribution de produits d'hygiène bucco-dentaire, de beauté et de soins corporels, d'aliments et biens de consommation courante.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 30.10.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Lausanne | 10.01.2005 | 29.10.2020 | |
KPMG SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 09.01.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sunstar Suisse Ltd
- Sunstar Suisse AG
- Sunstar Lausanne SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
26.05.2015 | active | 54046/2015 | |
06.08.2014 | active | 58697/2014 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Sunstar Suisse SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006096209, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Suisse SA, à Etoy, CHE-109.907.042 (FOSC du 12.01.2024, p. 0/1005933238). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Hinderer Jörg, de Milvignes, à Dully, directeur. Procuration collective à deux est conférée à Bujard René, de Lutry, à Collex-Bossy.
Publication number: HR02-1005933238, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Suisse SA, à Etoy, CHE-109.907.042 (FOSC du 18.12.2023, p. 0/1005913086). Katsura Seiji n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. La signature de Yoshioka Takashi est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005913086, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Sunstar Suisse SA, à Etoy, CHE-109.907.042 (FOSC du 26.10.2023, p. 0/1005870059). Okamoto Yuji est maintenant à Morges.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.