Mark Ehrsam
domiciled in Magden, from Rümlingen Active mandates: younïq gmbh, Stiftung WohnWerk Connected persons: Claudia Kirsch, Verena Anita Höhener, Nicole Schwarzenbach and more You can stay up to date through "Mark Ehrsam", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mark Ehrsam"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Mark Ehrsam", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mark Ehrsam"
|
|
Mark Ehrsam
domiciled in Ipsach, from Basel Active mandates: Wellvida AG Connected persons: Beat Scheidegger, Fredy Brügger You can stay up to date through "Mark Ehrsam", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mark Ehrsam"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Mark Ehrsam", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mark Ehrsam"
|
Places where people with the name Mark Ehrsam live
Sectors in which people with the name Mark Ehrsam work
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Private persons with the name Mark Ehrsam
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Mark Ehrsam
Publication number: HR02-1005945377, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
younïq gmbh, bisher in Bern, CHE-271.953.713, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2021, Publ. 1005314304).
Statutenänderung:
30.11.2023. 18.01.2024.
Sitz neu:
Magden.
Domizil neu:
Weiere 27, 4312 Magden.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilung an die Gesellschafter: Schriftlich oder mit elektronischer Post.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kammermann-Teunissen, Maria Johanna, genannt Marjon, von Vechigen, in Tschingel ob Gunten (Sigriswil), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kirsch, Claudia, von Trub, in Magden, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 38 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00];
Ehrsam, Mark, von Rümlingen, in Magden, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 37 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005676306, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wellvida AG, in Schüpfen, CHE-289.887.205, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2022, Publ. 1005541692).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheidegger, Beat, von Huttwil, in Innerberg (Wohlen bei Bern), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ehrsam, Mark, von Basel, in Ipsach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005314304, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
younïq gmbh, in Bern, CHE-271.953.713, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2017, Publ. 3910027).
Domizil neu:
c/o Verena Höhener, Bürglenstrasse 57, 3006 Bern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höhener, Verena Anita, von Thal, in Tschingel ob Gunten (Sigriswil), Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00];
Kammermann-Teunissen, Maria Johanna, genannt Marjon, von Vechigen, in Tschingel ob Gunten (Sigriswil), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00];
Kirsch Ehrsam, Claudia, von Trub, in Magden, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00;
Ehrsam, Mark, von Rümlingen, in Magden, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 25 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00.