Reports for Zentrum Schönberg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Zentrum Schönberg AG
- Zentrum Schönberg AG from Bern operates in the sector «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities» and is active.
- The management of the company Zentrum Schönberg AG, which was founded on the 03.01.2012, consists of 4 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 22.05.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-497.256.232.
- ETOILE - soziale Teilhabe im Alter, OPAN CARE AG, Pro Vita 24 GmbH are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Schuler,
Stefan Ralf Knabl,
Tanja Désirée Hilber,
Dr. oec. Luca Stäger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.01.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.052.735-4
UID/VAT
CHE-497.256.232
CHE-255.364.990 VAT
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines gemeinnützigen Kompetenzzentrums Demenz, Palliation und Langzeitpflege 'Schönberg' in Bern. Der Betrieb umfasst die Betreuung, Unterstützung und Pflege demenzkranker oder langzeitpflegebedürftiger Menschen sowie Menschen in palliativen Situationen in allen Belangen, während allen Phasen der Krankheit, die Beratung, Betreuung und Unterstützung ihrer Angehörigen sowie die Wissenschaft, Forschung und Lehre in den Bereichen der Demenz, Palliation und Langzeitpflege (Wissenszentrum). Die Gesellschaft kann weitere Unternehmungen dieser Art gründen und betreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 14.09.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reoplan Treuhand AG | Bern | 06.01.2012 | 13.09.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Zentrum Schönberg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006036657, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zentrum Schönberg AG, in Bern, CHE-497.256.232, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 04.03.2024, Publ. 1005976056).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willi, Nora, von Domat/Ems, in Bolligen, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bucher, Katrin, von Schwarzenburg, in Burgdorf, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jenni, Giovanna Alessandra Giuditta, von Niederhünigen, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steffen-Bürgi, Barbara, von Zürich, in Thunstetten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schuler, Barbara, von Spiringen, in Lachen SZ (Lachen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005976056, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zentrum Schönberg AG, in Bern, CHE-497.256.232, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 23.10.2023, Publ. 1005866451).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hahn, Sabine, von Matten bei Interlaken, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005866451, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Zentrum Schönberg AG, in Bern, CHE-497.256.232, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 07.06.2023, Publ. 1005762386).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stäger, Luca, von Merenschwand, in Einsiedeln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.