Reports for Velleuer Holding GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Velleuer Holding GmbH
- Velleuer Holding GmbH in St. Gallen is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of investment companies». Velleuer Holding GmbH is active.
- The management of the company Velleuer Holding GmbH consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 13.03.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Velleuer Holding GmbH is the following: CHE-433.686.972.
- Companies with the same address as Velleuer Holding GmbH: Experten Dienstleistung Lux AG, Frei & Gmünder AG, Litex AG.
Management (3)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Marc Dominique Velleuer,
Désirée Brigitte Velleuer,
Ives Schäpper
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.07.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.019.753-2
UID/VAT
CHE-433.686.972
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen aller Art an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Credor AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Zürich | 29.09.2015 | 04.01.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- cplusm Holding GmbH
- cplusm GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Velleuer Holding GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005984594, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Velleuer Holding GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-433.686.972, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 06.08.2020, Publ. 1004953049).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Velleuer, Marc Dominique, von Zürich, in Zumikon, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Pfäffikon SZ (Freienbach)];
Schäpper, Ives, von Buchs (SG), in Mörschwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Berneck].
Publication number: HR02-1004953049, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Velleuer Holding GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-433.686.972, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 23.03.2020, Publ. 1004858260).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fintic, Dejan, von Herisau, in Teufen AR, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, .
Publication number: HR02-1004858260, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Velleuer Holding GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-433.686.972, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 17.08.2018, S.0, Publ. 4421505).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Velleuer, Marc Dominique, von Zürich, in Pfäffikon SZ (Freienbach), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in St. Gallen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Müller, Désirée Brigitte, von Unterkulm, in Zürich, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.