Reports for Frei & Gmünder AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Frei & Gmünder AG
- Frei & Gmünder AG with its legal headquarters in St. Gallen is active. Frei & Gmünder AG operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Frei & Gmünder AG consists of 3 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 08.12.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-103.437.167.
- There are 11 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Experten Dienstleistung Lux AG, Litex AG, Luka Beteiligungen AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.04.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.023.434-5
UID/VAT
CHE-103.437.167
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Architektur- und Planungsbüros, insbesondere Planung und Ausführung von Hochbauten sowie Planung von Quartier-, Gestaltungs-, und Realüberbauungsplänen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen sowie im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Buchhaltungs- und Treuhand AG Altstätten SG | Altstätten | <2004 | 17.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Frei u. Gmünder AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Frei & Gmünder AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005905252, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Frei & Gmünder AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.437.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 03.09.2018, S.0, Publ. 4447631).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eisenbart, Norbert, von Oberbüren, in St. Margrethen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-0004447631, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Frei & Gmünder AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.437.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 27.01.2017, Publ. 3310747).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frei, Hanspeter, von Diepoldsau, in Mörschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gmünder, Martin, von Appenzell, in Thal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Seiler, Miriam, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Baldauf, Oliver, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Scheidegg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rausch, Zeno, von Avers, in Wallisellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3310747, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Frei & Gmünder AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.437.167, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2016, Publ. 2961405).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumschlager, Karl, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lauterach (AT), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Seiler, Miriam, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Baldauf, Oliver, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Scheidegg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.