Reports for Ulrich Beyeler GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ulrich Beyeler GmbH
- Ulrich Beyeler GmbH is active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Liestal.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 30.06.2010.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 13.07.2015.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Ulrich Beyeler GmbH is the following: CHE-115.802.776.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: KINOORIS BAR GmbH, Rihm Holding AG, TIBAG Trust Insurance Broker AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.2010
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.013.839-4
UID/VAT
CHE-115.802.776
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratungen und Gutachten in Bau- und Immobilienfragen, Liegenschaftsbewertungen und Bautreuhand. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ulrich Beyeler GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2265577, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Ulrich Beyeler GmbH, in Liestal, CHE-115.802.776, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 06.07.2010, S. 9, Publ. 5712948).
Domizil neu:
Kanonengasse 15, 4410 Liestal.
Publication number: 5712948, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Ulrich Beyeler GmbH, in Liestal, CH-280.4.013.839-4, Kanonengasse 19, 4410 Liestal, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
28.06.2010.
Zweck:
Beratungen und Gutachten in Bau- und Immobilienfragen, Liegenschaftsbewertungen und Bautreuhand. Die Gesellschaft kann zudem alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des erloschenen Einzelunternehmens 'Ulrich Beyeler, Architekt ETH SIA', in Liestal (CH-280.2.912.203-6), gemäss Vertrag vom 28.06.2010 und Bilanz per 01.01.2010 mit Aktiven von CHF 426'806.09 und Passiven von CHF 83'549.54 zum Preis von CHF 343'256.55, wofür 20 Stammanteile zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 323'256.55 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Gesellschafter erfolgen durch eingeschriebene Briefe. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 28.06.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Beyeler, Ulrich, von Guggisberg und Zürich, in Liestal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.