Reports for KINOORIS BAR GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KINOORIS BAR GmbH
- KINOORIS BAR GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Liestal. KINOORIS BAR GmbH belongs to the industry «Operation of cinemas» and is currently active.
- The management of the company KINOORIS BAR GmbH consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 21.12.2016.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.05.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BL is CHE-272.406.997.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Rihm Holding AG, TIBAG Trust Insurance Broker AG, Ulrich Beyeler GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.020.733-1
UID/VAT
CHE-272.406.997
Sector
Operation of cinemas
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung eines Kinos und eines Gastronomiebetriebes, sowie die Durchführung von Anlässen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KINOORIS BAR GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004636779, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
KINOORIS BAR GmbH, in Liestal, CHE-272.406.997, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2018, Publ. 1004503588).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Beyeler, Ulrich, von Zürich, in Liestal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rihm, Ornella, von Birsfelden, in Liestal, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Rihm, Kim, von Birsfelden, in Liestal, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004503588, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
KINOORIS BAR GmbH, in Liestal, CHE-272.406.997, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 29.10.2018, Publ. 1004485854).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Beyeler, Ulrich, von Zürich, in Liestal, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004485854, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
KINOORIS BAR GmbH, in Liestal, CHE-272.406.997, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 06.11.2017, Publ. 3851605).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vogt, Melissa, von Lauwil, in Diegten, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.