Reports for Swiss Visio SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Visio SA
- Swiss Visio SA with its legal headquarters in Genolier is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of medical and dental practices». Swiss Visio SA is active.
- The company was founded on 09.08.2007 and has 7 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 15.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-113.765.905.
- The address is identical with 15 other active companies. These include: Aevum Fondation de Prévoyance, Cabinet Médical, Lang, CabVisTho Sàrl.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Fabrice Zumbrunnen,
Pietro Fabrizio,
Flavia Botticini,
Alexander Feij,
Philipp Marc Gasche
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.08.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genolier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.051.343-7
UID/VAT
CHE-113.765.905
CHE-440.413.184 VAT
Sector
Operation of medical and dental practices
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'établissements médico-chirurgicaux, ainsi que l'installation, l'organisation et l'exploitation de tout service médical nécessaire au traitement des malades ou à la recherche scientifique, plus particulièrement dans le domaine de l'ophtalmologie. La société peut: exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE), en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger; participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but; accorder des prêts ou des garanties de toutes sortes à des actionnaires, des sociétés du groupe ou des tiers.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 07.11.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORFA Audit SA | Lausanne | 15.08.2007 | 07.11.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Genolier Swiss Visio Network SA
- Genolier Swiss Ophthalmic Network SA
- Visionplus SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Visio SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006107618, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Visio SA, à Genolier, CHE-113.765.905 (FOSC du 23.07.2024, p. 0/1006091975). Cauzza Dino et Hubert Antoine ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Fabrizio Pietro, qui n'est plus directeur, et Zumbrunnen Fabrice, de Aeschi bei Spiez, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, sont membres du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux. Vanderschueren Séverine est désormais de Genolier.
Publication number: HR02-1006091975, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Visio SA, à Genolier, CHE-113.765.905 (FOSC du 29.11.2021, p. 0/1005344890).
Fusion:
reprise des actifs et passifs de Gutsehen.ch AG, à Pfäffikon (CHE-113.666.338), selon contrat de fusion du 14.06.2024 et bilan au 31.12.2023, présentant des actifs de CHF 411'408, des passifs envers les tiers de CHF 28'817, soit un actif net de CHF 382'591. La continuité du sociétariat étant garantie, la fusion ne donne pas lieu à une augmentation du capital, ni à une attribution d'actions. Statuts modifiés le 25.06.2024.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but l'exploitation d'établissements médico-chirurgicaux, ainsi que l'installation, l'organisation et l'exploitation de tout service médical nécessaire au traitement des malades ou à la recherche scientifique, plus particulièrement dans le domaine de l'ophtalmologie.
La société peut:
exercer toute activité financière, commerciale ou industrielle, mobilière ou immobilière, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE), en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
créer des succursales ou des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger;
participer à toutes entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but;
accorder des prêts ou des garanties de toutes sortes à des actionnaires, des sociétés du groupe ou des tiers. Les 1'000 actions nominatives de CHF 100 sont désormais restreintes quant à la transmissibilité.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit (courrier recommandé ou courrier simple), par voie électronique (fax ou email) ou par avis inséré dans la Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Publication number: HR02-1005344890, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Visio SA, à Genolier, CHE-113.765.905 (FOSC du 13.07.2021, p. 0/1005248092). La signature de Jandric Daniel est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.