Reports for Rohrer-Marti AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rohrer-Marti AG
- Rohrer-Marti AG from Zollikofen operates in the sector «Trading with machines» and is active.
- The company was founded on 19.02.1946.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.11.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Rohrer-Marti AG is the following: CHE-103.486.378.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Green Peak GmbH, Ott Landmaschinen AG, Stuber Holding AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Roger Gauderon Moser,
Daniel Stuber,
Christian Rüegsegger,
Peter Liniger,
Hanspeter Tüscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.02.1946
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Münchenbuchsee
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.006.446-5
UID/VAT
CHE-103.486.378
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Fabrikation von Maschinen, im Besonderen Baumaschinen, Baugeräten, Bauwerkzeugen, Fördermittel, Staplern und Fahrzeugen sowie Betrieb einer Reparaturwerkstätte. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 19.11.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rosser Treuhand AG | Ittigen | 04.12.2019 | 18.11.2021 | |
Rosser Treuhand | Ittigen | <2004 | 03.12.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rohrer-Marti Ltd
- Rohrer-Marti SA
- Rohrer-Marti Holding AG
- Rohrer-Marti Ulrich AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rohrer-Marti AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005337702, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rohrer-Marti AG, in Münchenbuchsee, CHE-103.486.378, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 17.02.2020, Publ. 1004831452).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rosser Treuhand AG (CHE-422.904.047), in Worblaufen (Ittigen), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stuber, Daniel, von Buchegg, in Kyburg-Buchegg (Buchegg), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zimmermann, Daniel Dr., von Luzern und Basel, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Liniger, Peter, von Wohlen bei Bern, in Schwenden im Diemtigtal (Diemtigen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
T + R AG (CHE-105.857.623), in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004831452, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rohrer-Marti AG, in Münchenbuchsee, CHE-103.486.378, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2019, Publ. 1004774347).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hostettler, Andreas, von Schwarzenburg, in Bargen BE, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004774347, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rohrer-Marti AG, in Münchenbuchsee, CHE-103.486.378, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 18.06.2014, S.0, Publ. 1560519).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rosser Treuhand (CHE-107.411.959), in Ittigen, Revisionsstelle;
Zahnd, Barbara, von Schwarzenburg, in Zollikofen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosser Treuhand AG (CHE-422.904.047), in Worblaufen (Ittigen), Revisionsstelle;
Gauderon Moser, Roger, von St. Antoni, in Kestenholz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.