Reports for Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG
- Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Wilen (Sarnen).
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 19.12.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.436.441.
Management (5)
newest board members
Roger Burch,
Hermann Franz Burch-Birrer,
Stefan Ignatius Rammelmeyer,
Daniel Halter,
Heinz Karl Rammelmeyer-Herzig
newest authorized signatories
Roger Burch,
Hermann Franz Burch-Birrer,
Stefan Ignatius Rammelmeyer,
Heinz Karl Rammelmeyer-Herzig
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.08.1926
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sarnen
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.000.413-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.436.441
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb, die Bebauung, die Verwaltung sowie die Veräusserung von Grundstücken und Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmen gleicher Branche beteiligen. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
COBALU GmbH in Liquidation | Luzern | 06.01.2009 | 21.05.2009 | |
Schild Treuhand AG in Liquidation | Luzern | <2004 | 29.06.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rammelmeyer AG Wilen-Sarnen, in Wilen
- Rammelmeyer AG Wilen-Sarnen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005631696, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG, in Sarnen, CHE-101.436.441, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 08.05.2018, Publ. 4217275).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rammelmeyer, Silvia, von Guttannen, in Maschwanden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4217275, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG, in Sarnen, CHE-101.436.441, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 25.09.2017, Publ. 3769729).
Statutenänderung:
01.05.2018.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb, die Bebauung, die Verwaltung sowie die Veräusserung von Grundstücken und Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmen gleicher Branche beteiligen. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rammelmeyer, Heinz, von Guttannen, in Hünenberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift mit Hermann Franz Burch oder Roger Burch [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Rammelmeyer, Silvia, von Guttannen, in Maschwanden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Halter, Daniel, von Lungern, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rammelmeyer, Stefan, von Guttannen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift mit Hermann Franz Burch [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Burch, Hermann Franz, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift mit Heinz Rammelmeyer oder Stefan Rammelmeyer;
Burch, Roger, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift mit Heinz Rammelmeyer.
Publication number: 3769729, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Rammelmeyer Immobilien AG, in Sarnen, CHE-101.436.441, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2013, Publ. 994901).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rammelmeyer, Stefan, von Guttannen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.