Reports for Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A.
- Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A. has its legal headquarters in Courtételle, is active and operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The management of the company Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A. consists of 6 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.12.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of JU under the UID CHE-107.186.774.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: JMB Holding SA, Jolbat S.A..
Management (6)
newest board members
Alain Gérard Joliat,
Michel Joliat,
Jean-Marc Joliat,
Bernard André Joliat
newest authorized signatories
Alain Gérard Joliat,
Muriel Rose-Marie Joliat Hof,
Nicolas Bernard Humair,
Michel Joliat,
Jean-Marc Joliat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courtételle
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.001.099-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.186.774
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
entreprise de construction, de génie civil et de travaux publics, atelier d'architecture
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAG Jura SA | Delémont | 19.11.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
François Chapatte S.A. | Delémont | 11.03.1994 | 18.11.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Les Fils de Marc Joliat SA
- Les Fils de Joliat Marc SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005356014, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A., à Courtételle, CHE-107.186.774, société anonyme (No. FOSC 224 du 19.11.2019, Publ. 1004763263).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Joliat, Alain Gérard, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Humair, Nicolas Bernard, de Les Genevez (JU), à Courtételle, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Joliat Hof, Muriel Rose-Marie, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, directrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004763263, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A., à Courtételle, CHE-107.186.774, société anonyme (No. FOSC 23 du 05.02.2003, p.10, Publ. 847974).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
FIDAG Jura SA (CHE-105.190.411), à Delémont, organe de révision [précédemment: François Chapatte S.A.]
Publication number: 847974, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A., à Courtételle, entreprise de construction, de génie civil et de travaux publics, atelier d'architecture, Société anonyme (FOSC no 50 du 11.03.1994, p. 1364).
Personne et signature radiée:
Joliat, Gérard, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.