Reports for Jolbat S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jolbat S.A.
- Jolbat S.A. with its legal headquarters in Courtételle is active. Jolbat S.A. operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.12.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Jolbat S.A. is the following: CHE-102.205.246.
- Next to the company Jolbat S.A. there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: JMB Holding SA, Les Fils de Marc Joliat S.A..
Management (6)
newest board members
Alain Gérard Joliat,
Bernard André Joliat,
Michel Joliat,
Jean-Marc Joliat
newest authorized signatories
Alain Gérard Joliat,
Bernard André Joliat,
Elodie Joliat,
Muriel Rose-Marie Joliat Hof,
Michel Joliat
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.07.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courtételle
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.001.098-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.205.246
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, construction, rénovation, exploitation et gérance de tous immeubles.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDAG Jura SA | Delémont | 29.11.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Transjurane SA | Delémont | 07.09.2007 | 28.11.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Joliat, Les Fils de Marc SA.
- Jolbat SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jolbat S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005356013, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Jolbat S.A., à Courtételle, CHE-102.205.246, société anonyme (No. FOSC 232 du 29.11.2019, Publ. 1004771779).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Joliat, Alain Gérard, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Joliat, Bernard André, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Joliat, Elodie, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, directrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Joliat Hof, Muriel Rose-Marie, de Courtételle, à Courtételle, directrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004771779, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Jolbat S.A., à Courtételle, CHE-102.205.246, société anonyme (No. FOSC 173 du 07.09.2007, p.10, Publ. 4101038).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
FIDAG Jura SA (CHE-105.190.411), à Delémont, organe de révision [précédemment: Audit Transjurane SA].
Publication number: 4101038, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Jolbat S.A., à Courtételle, CH-670.3.001.098-4, Achat, vente, construction, rénovation, exploitation et gérance de tous immeubles, Société anonyme (FOSC no 82 du 30.04.2007, p. 8, publ. 3907614).
Personne et signature radiée:
C.M. Management Services S.A., à Delémont, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne:
Audit Transjurane SA, à Delémont, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.