Address
c/o Uhlmann Immo AG
Töpferweg 17
3612 Steffisburg
Reports for Kumrec Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kumrec Holding AG
- Kumrec Holding AG in Steffisburg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Kumrec Holding AG is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 24.11.2006.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 25.10.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Kumrec Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.281.323.
- Companies with an identical address: ELDI Holding AG, Uhlmann Immo AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.11.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Steffisburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.017.930-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.281.323
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, Verkauf und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen aller Art an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen sowie damit zusammenhängende Koordinations-, Finanzierungs- und Managementaufgaben. Die Gesellschaft kann gewerbliche Schutzrechte und Know-How erwerben, verwalten und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gerber Treuhand + Revision AG | Grosshöchstetten | 30.11.2006 | 18.04.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kumrec Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005318944, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kumrec Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-113.281.323, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 03.12.2018, Publ. 1004510473).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stucki, Nadia Francesca Marlin, von Konolfingen, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Germann, Eveline Chantal, von Adelboden, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004510473, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kumrec Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-113.281.323, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2016, Publ. 2786387).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kumli, Werner, von Utzenstorf, in Thun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stucki, Nadia Francesca Marlin, von Konolfingen, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2786387, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kumrec Holding AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-113.281.323, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2006, Publ. 3658416).
Statutenänderung:
18.12.2015.
Domizil neu:
c/o Uhlmann Immo AG, Töpferweg 17, 3612 Steffisburg.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, Verkauf und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen aller Art an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen sowie damit zusammenhängende Koordinations-, Finanzierungs- und Managementaufgaben. Die Gesellschaft kann gewerbliche Schutzrechte und Know-How erwerben, verwalten und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: durch Brief oder durch E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung vom 18.12.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kumli, Bruno, von Utzenstorf, in Thun, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kumli, Bettina, von Utzenstorf, in Steffisburg, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber Treuhand + Revision AG, in Grosshöchstetten, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kumli, Eliane, von Utzenstorf, in Steffisburg, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.