Reports for Gysin Asiko AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gysin Asiko AG
- Gysin Asiko AG with its legal headquarters in Böckten is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Production of metal goods». Gysin Asiko AG is active.
- Gysin Asiko AG was founded on 27.06.2013.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 02.06.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-327.073.157.
- On the same address as Gysin Asiko AG there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: PG-Immobilien AG, TG Holding AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Christian Martin Herbst,
Thomas Gysin,
Urs Luginbühl,
Eric Jecker,
Markus Gysin
newest authorized signatories
Christian Martin Herbst,
Thomas Gysin,
Urs Luginbühl,
Eric Jecker,
Markus Gysin
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Böckten
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.016.994-4
UID/VAT
CHE-327.073.157
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb einer Metallverarbeitungsfirma im Bereich der Projektierung, Planung, Herstellung und Montage von Metallkonstruktionen für den Stahl-, Apparate- und Anlagenbau. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Tätigkeiten ausüben, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Hauptzweck im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen errichten oder erwerben sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Urs Baumann & Partner AG | Reinach (BL) | 27.06.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Stephan Revisions AG | Muttenz | 30.09.2013 | 26.06.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gysin Asiko AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005759126, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Asiko AG, in Böckten, CHE-327.073.157, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2021, Publ. 1005365613).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gysin, Ulrich, von Tecknau, in Dornach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herbst, Christian, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005365613, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Asiko AG, in Böckten, CHE-327.073.157, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2019, Publ. 1004661380).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gysin, Thomas, von Tecknau, in Zeglingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004661380, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gysin Asiko AG, in Böckten, CHE-327.073.157, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 13.05.2019, Publ. 1004628522).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stephan Revisions AG (CHE-103.892.287), in Muttenz, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Urs Baumann & Partner AG (CHE-105.607.486), in Reinach (BL), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.