Reports for Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen
- Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen in Itingen is a Cooperative from the sector «Electrical power production and utilities». Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen is active.
- The management of the organization Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 25.08.1966.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.06.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-101.666.521.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Rolf Stöckli,
Martin Jaggi-Schaffner,
Ernst Häfelfinger,
Filip Raimond Baechtold,
Nathalie Janine Steiner
newest authorized signatories
Rolf Stöckli,
Martin Jaggi-Schaffner,
Ernst Häfelfinger,
Filip Raimond Baechtold,
Nathalie Janine Steiner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.08.1966
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Itingen
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.5.910.317-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.666.521
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Abgabe elektrischer Energie im Rahmen der technischen und wirtschaftlichen Möglichkeiten zu angemessenen Bedingungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hersberger Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Seltisberg | 28.06.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung | Basel | 02.07.2014 | 27.06.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Elektra Itingen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006070170, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen, in Itingen, CHE-101.666.521, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2017, Publ. 3671611).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krenger-Egger, Alfred, von Itingen, in Itingen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Alltax AG Wirtschaftsprüfung (CHE-105.815.004), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stöckli, Rolf, von Hofstetten-Flüh, in Itingen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hersberger Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CHE-107.796.642), in Seltisberg, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3671611, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen, in Itingen, CHE-101.666.521, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2016, Publ. 2999299).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imhof-Guldenmann, Felix, von Itingen, in Itingen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jaggi, Martin, von Itingen, in Itingen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2999299, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Elektra Itingen, in Itingen, CHE-101.666.521, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1587445).
Statutenänderung:
27.04.2016.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Howald, Annamarie, von Wangenried, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Regenass-Hugentobler, Markus, von Ramlinsburg, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häfelfinger-Schaub, Marianne, von Sissach, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Pfiffner, Walter, von Mels, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Lurz-Finkbeiner, Christine, von Liestal und Mellingen, in Itingen, Mitglied, Aktuarin und Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baechtold, Filip Raimond, von Schleitheim, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häfelfinger, Ernst, von Sissach, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steiner, Nathalie Janine, von Herisau, in Itingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.