Reports for Famoex AG in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Famoex AG in Liquidation
- Famoex AG in Liquidation with its legal headquarters in Malans GR is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Famoex AG in Liquidation is in liquidation.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 30.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GR under the UID CHE-100.626.387.
- On the same address as Famoex AG in Liquidation there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: FAI AG, Kialo AG, S.A. de la Communication Sécurisée SCS.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Malans
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.908.415-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.626.387
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerben, Mieten, Halten und Bewirtschaften von Immobilien zur eigenen Nutzung und Vermietung an Dritte. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, solche erwerben oder errichten sowie gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Know-How, Immaterialgüterrechte und Grundstücke erwerben, verwerten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Buchhaltungs- und Treuhand AG Altstätten SG | Altstätten | <2004 | 22.07.2009 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Famoex AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: LS01-0000049196, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Aktiengesellschaft Publikationsdatum: SHAB 30.08.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 30.08.2029 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Monika Frech, Jeninserstrasse 18, 7208 Malans GR Liquidationsschuldenruf Famoex AG in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: Famoex AG in Liquidation CHE-100.626.387 Jeninserstrasse 18
Kontaktstelle: Monika Frech, Jeninserstrasse 18,
Publication number: HR02-1006107417, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Famoex AG, in Malans, CHE-100.626.387, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 21.04.2021, Publ. 1005155266).
Firma neu:
Famoex AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 29.04.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frech, Monika, von Zürich, in Malans, Mitglied und Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied und Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sandow, Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Solingen (DE), Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3216119, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Famoex AG, in Malans, CHE-100.626.387, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2013, Publ. 7031134).
Domizil neu:
Jeninserstrasse 18, 7208 Malans GR.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Möller, Henning, von Seengen, in Malans, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frech, Monika, von Zürich, in Malans, Mitglied und Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Zürich und Rothenfluh, Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sandow, Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Solingen (DE), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.