Reports for SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG
- SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG with its legal headquarters in Malans GR is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of investment companies». SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG is active.
- The company was founded on 22.06.2011.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 21.04.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register GR under the UID CHE-156.912.534.
- FAI AG, Kialo AG, S.A. de la Communication Sécurisée SCS are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Malans
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.011.154-8
UID/VAT
CHE-156.912.534
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft kann alle Handelsgeschäfte tätigen, namentlich durch eine Beteiligung an anderen Gesellschaften; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005155288, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG, in Malans, CHE-156.912.534, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2016, Publ. 3241113).
Statutenänderung:
13.04.2021.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Sofern der Gesellschaft die Namen und Adressen aller Aktionäre bekannt sind und das Gesetz nicht zwingend etwas anderes bestimmt, können die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre durch Brief oder auf elektronischem Wege erfolgen.
Publication number: 3241113, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG, in Malans, CHE-156.912.534, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2011, Publ. 6223422).
Domizil neu:
Jeninserstrasse 18, 7208 Malans GR.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Möller, Henning, von Seengen, in Malans, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brög, Sebastian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6223422, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG, in Malans, CH-350.3.011.154-8, c/o Henning Möller, Nuttgasse 8, 7208 Malans GR, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
15.06.2011.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft kann alle Handelsgeschäfte tätigen, namentlich durch eine Beteiligung an anderen Gesellschaften;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB. Gemäss Erklärung vom 15.06.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Möller, Henning, von Seengen, in Malans GR (Malans), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Frech, Monika, von Zürich, in Malans GR (Malans), Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.