Reports for EHCS Gastro GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EHCS Gastro GmbH
- EHCS Gastro GmbH with its legal headquarters in Seewen SZ is a Limited liability company from the sector «Operation of restaurants». EHCS Gastro GmbH is active.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- On the 21.08.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-448.967.115.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Eishockey-Club Seewen, Kunsteisbahn Zingel AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.07.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Schwyz
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.020.973-9
UID/VAT
CHE-448.967.115
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Restaurants sowie die Erbringung von Gastronomie- oder ähnlichen Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen. Sie kann ferner Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EHCS Gastro GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004962303, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
EHCS Gastro GmbH, in Schwyz, CHE-448.967.115, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2018, Publ. 4435843).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bolfing, Bruno, von Schwyz, in Ingenbohl, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Item, Eduard, von Surses, in Steinen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4435843, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
EHCS Gastro GmbH, in Schwyz, CHE-448.967.115, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 06.08.2014, Publ. 1648853).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Horat, Barbara, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schuler-Steiner, Patricia, von Schwyz, in Steinen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1648853, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
EHCS Gastro GmbH, in Schwyz, CHE-448.967.115, Seemattliweg 29, 6423 Seewen SZ, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
29.07.2014.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Restaurants sowie die Erbringung von Gastronomie- oder ähnlichen Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen. Sie kann ferner Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen durch Brief, Fax oder E-Mail an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 29.7.2014 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Eishockey-Club Seewen (CHE-114.853.618), in Schwyz, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Bolfing, Bruno, von Schwyz, in Ingenbohl, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Horat, Barbara, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.