Address
Deisrütistrasse 6, Oberohringen
8472 Seuzach
Reports for Calorifer Engineering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Calorifer Engineering AG
- Calorifer Engineering AG has its legal headquarters in Seuzach and is active. It operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Calorifer Engineering AG, which was founded on the 15.01.2016, consists of 5 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 05.02.2020. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Calorifer Engineering AG is the following: CHE-213.312.786.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Dragan Popovic,
Bill Garcia,
Roger Murer,
Andreas Dinhard Keller,
Reto Karl Schuhmacher
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Seuzach
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.042.883-5
UID/VAT
CHE-213.312.786
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel und das Engineering von wärmetechnischen Apparaten, die Ausführung von Eisen- und Blechkonstruktionen sowie Übernahme von Vertretungen auf diesen Gebieten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eugster Treuhand AG | Dübendorf | 20.01.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Calorifer Engineering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004822302, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 234 vom 03.12.2019 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 46'201 vom 28.11.2019 Calorifer Engineering AG, in Seuzach, CHE-213.312.786, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 03.12.2019, Publ. 1004773033).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bing, Xie, chinesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dalian Liaoning (CN), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004773033, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Calorifer Engineering AG, in Seuzach, CHE-213.312.786, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2017, Publ. 3936405).
Statutenänderung:
13.11.2019.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 850'000.00 [bisher: CHF 300'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 850'000.00 [bisher: CHF 300'000.00].
Aktien neu:
8'500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 13.11.2019 werden Forderungen in der Höhe von CHF 550'000.00 verrechnet, wofür 5'500 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 ausgegeben werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Popovic, Dragan, von Röthenbach im Emmental, in Seuzach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Garcia, Bill, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Singapore (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3936405, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Calorifer Engineering AG, in Seuzach, CHE-213.312.786, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 20.01.2016, Publ. 2607139).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Murer, Roger, von Beckenried, in Wangen-Brüttisellen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.