Dr. Claudia Vogel
domiciled in Schliern b. Köniz, from Germany Active mandates: Verein Teach a Child - Africa Connected persons: Christina Häberli-Fontana, Andrea Essl, Simone Ursula Häberli You can stay up to date through "Dr. Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Claudia Vogel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Claudia Vogel"
|
|
Claudia Vogel
domiciled in 6440 Ingenbohl, from Schwyz Active mandates: Valitas Sammelstiftung BVG Connected persons: Heinz Schär, Raphael Gavilano, Elzbieta Appert and more You can stay up to date through "Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudia Vogel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudia Vogel"
|
|
Claudia Vogel
domiciled in Hallwil, from Hallwil Active mandates: Claudia Vogel Coaching & Consulting GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudia Vogel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claudia Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claudia Vogel"
|
Places where people with the name Claudia Vogel live
Sectors in which people with the name Claudia Vogel work
Other social services
Operation of an pension fund
Services regarding management consulting
Other social services
Operation of an pension fund
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Claudia Vogel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claudia Vogel
Publication number: HR02-1006119106, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 164 vom 26.08.2024 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 36'683 vom 21.08.2024 Valitas Sammelstiftung BVG, in Zürich, CHE-109.433.423, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 26.08.2024, Publ. 1006113690).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vogel, Claudia, von Schwyz, in Ingenbohl, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: in Schwyz].
Publication number: HR02-1006113690, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Valitas Sammelstiftung BVG, in Zürich, CHE-109.433.423, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2023, Publ. 1005904646).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Betti, Marco, von Zürich, in Affoltern am Albis, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hardegger, Ralf, von Chur, in Blauen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hörler, Monika, von Teufen (AR), in Bürglen (TG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruckstuhl, Barbara, von Thalwil, in Adliswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gavilano, Raphael, von Eschenbach (SG), in Hünenberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: stellvertretender Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Appert, Elzbieta, von Steinen, in Oberrüti, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schär, Heinz, von Dürrenroth, in Freienbach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, Claudia, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006007448, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Tellco Bank AG, in Schwyz, CHE-103.452.184, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 03.04.2024, Publ. 1005999238).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schleuniger, Urs, von Klingnau, in Horgen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kuster, Andreas, von Schüpfheim, in Zug, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schär, Heinz, von Dürrenroth, in Birmensdorf (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sigrist, Martin Franz, von Sarnen, in Sarnen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Vogel, Claudia, von Schwyz, in Ingenbohl, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Straub, Roland, von Hefenhofen, in Richterswil, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bruhin, Heinrich, von Schübelbach, in Geroldswil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Morf, Patrick, von Adliswil, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Sjeverac, Tatjana, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Soliva, Andreas, von Tujetsch, in Thalwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].