Giovanni Miccoli
domiciled in Zürich, from Italy Active mandates: Dreikönigs-Stiftung, Zürich Connected persons: Julius Zihlmann, Mirjam Wyrsch, Janine Blumer and more You can stay up to date through "Giovanni Miccoli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Giovanni Miccoli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Giovanni Miccoli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Giovanni Miccoli"
|
Places where people with the name Giovanni Miccoli live
Sectors in which people with the name Giovanni Miccoli work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Giovanni Miccoli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Giovanni Miccoli
Publication number: 3053227, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Aquila & Co. AG, in Zürich, CHE-109.023.479, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 20.07.2016, Publ. 2964711).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Miccoli, Giovanni, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jain, Vivien, von Luzern, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Schieler, Katrin, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2225521, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GCM Capital GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-378.655.068, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 22.10.2012, Publ. 6898016).
Firma neu:
GCM Capital GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 12.06.2015 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Miccoli, Giovanni, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 7109624, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Aquila & Co. AG, in Zürich, CH-170.3.022.702-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2013, Publ. 7077210).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rhinow, René, von Basel, in Liestal, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Seltisberg];
Miccoli, Giovanni, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Maraia, Gianni, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.