Claude Pascal Lelièvre
domiciled in Les Cullayes, from Frankreich and Vuisternens-devant-Romont Active mandates: Küpfer et Fils S.A., Küpfer Holding SA and more Connected persons: Cédric Sarbach, Bastien Küpfer, Cédric Sarbach and more You can stay up to date through "Claude Pascal Lelièvre", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Pascal Lelièvre"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claude Pascal Lelièvre", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Pascal Lelièvre"
|
Places where people with the name Claude Pascal Lelièvre live
Sectors in which people with the name Claude Pascal Lelièvre work
Water and sewage utilities
Operation of other financial institutions
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Cleaning of buildings
Water and sewage utilities
Operation of other financial institutions
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Cleaning of buildings
Private persons with the name Claude Pascal Lelièvre
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claude Pascal Lelièvre
Publication number: HR02-1005808132, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KanalFritz GmbH, in Muri bei Bern, CHE-485.906.690, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 13.05.2020, Publ. 1004888359).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Liaudet Pial SA (CHE-103.827.999), in Renens VD, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Lelièvre, Claude, von Vuisternens-devant-Romont, in Les Cullayes (Servion), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Biberstein Jauslin, Gisela Carmela, von Hubersdorf, in Belp, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Jauslin, Stefan, von Muttenz, in Belp, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 18 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 2571435, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
snow du Valais Sàrl, à Bagnes, CHE-246.292.328, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 148 du 04.08.2015, Publ. 2305235).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
snow du Valais Sàrl en liquidation. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 16.12.2015.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Rodrigues, Charles, citoyen français, à Moulins-les-Metz (FR), président des gérants, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Lelièvre, Claude Pascal, de Vuisternens-devant-Romont, à Servion, gérant et liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: gérant avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 2562525, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
ski du Valais Sàrl, in Zermatt, CHE-156.759.847, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2015, Publ. 1945875).
Firma neu:
ski du Valais Sàrl in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 16.12.2015 aufgelöst.
Liquidationsadresse:
c/o Claude Lelièvre, Liaudet Pial SA, Chemin du Chêne 21, 1020 Renens.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rodrigues, Charles, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Moulins-les-Metz (FR), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lelièvre, Claude Pascal, von Vuisternens-devant-Romont, in Servion, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].