Branches (1)
Reports for Küpfer et Fils S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Küpfer et Fils S.A.
- Küpfer et Fils S.A. with its legal headquarters in Bex is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Water and sewage utilities». Küpfer et Fils S.A. is active.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- On the 19.07.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-105.731.666.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.04.1976
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bex
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.168.500-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.731.666
Sector
Water and sewage utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entreprise spécialisée de vidange de fosses septiques industrielles et sacs sur réseaux routiers, désableurs, rinçages et débouchages à haute pression des canalisations des collecteurs d'égouts et des bâtiments.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORFA Audit SA | Lausanne | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Küpfer et Fils SA
- Kupfer et Fils SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Küpfer et Fils S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089624, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer et Fils S.A., à Bex, CHE-105.731.666 (FOSC du 04.12.2023, p. 0/1005900430). Lovey Laurent n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005900430, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer et Fils S.A., à Bex, CHE-105.731.666 (FOSC du 05.10.2023, p. 0/1005853782). Radiation de la mention de l'existence d'une succursale à Monthey.
Publication number: HR02-1005853782, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer et Fils S.A., à Bex, CHE-105.731.666 (FOSC du 09.06.2022, p. 0/1005491874). Lovey Laurent n'est plus président. Lelièvre Claude, de Vuisternens-devant-Romont, à Servion, président, avec signature individuelle, et Sarbach Cédric, de Adelboden, à Servion, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.