Josef Huwyler
domiciled in Cham, from Mühlau Active mandates: schweizermessebau ag, Emano Trading GmbH and more Connected persons: Angela Häfeli, Rudolf Schibli, Christian Truog and more You can stay up to date through "Josef Huwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Huwyler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef Huwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Huwyler"
|
|
Josef Huwyler
domiciled in Hünenberg, from Mühlau Active mandates: Ortsbürgerstiftung Mühlau, Stiftung Geschwister Johanna und Pfarrer Dr. Hans Bissig Connected persons: Jörg Giger, Urs Schärer, Judith Weber-Giger and more You can stay up to date through "Josef Huwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Huwyler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef Huwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef Huwyler"
|
Places where people with the name Josef Huwyler live
Sectors in which people with the name Josef Huwyler work
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Trading in clothings
Operation of primary schools
Religious, political or secular associations
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Services for banks and credit institutions
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Trading in clothings
Operation of primary schools
Religious, political or secular associations
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Services for banks and credit institutions
Private persons with the name Josef Huwyler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Josef Huwyler
Publication number: HR02-1005549691, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
schweizermessebau ag, in Muri (AG), CHE-109.871.119, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2021, Publ. 1005326130).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schweizer, Beat, von Rüti bei Riggisberg, in Hagendorn , Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schibli, Rudolf, von Eiken, in Seedorf (UR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Weggis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Häfeli, Angela, von Seengen, in Seedorf (UR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Huwyler, Josef, von Mühlau, in Cham, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Truog, Christian, von Grüsch, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Walter, Tom, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meisterschwanden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005470895, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
VSSH Support AG, in Zug, CHE-110.356.166, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2022, Publ. 1005374135). Mit Erklärung vom 01.05.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huwyler, Josef, von Mühlau, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Graffenried AG Treuhand (CHE-103.633.774), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Angela, von Eriswil, in Zug, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005335654, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
VSSH Support AG, in Zürich, CHE-110.356.166, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2017, Publ. 3821943).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tettamanti, Carmilo Walter, von Luzern, in Horw, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Frei, Pirmin, von Affoltern am Albis, in Baar, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ribi, Markus, von Riehen, in Arlesheim, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauser, Philipp, von Glarus Nord, in Schänis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huwyler, Josef, von Mühlau, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.