Jörg Ewald
domiciled in Zürich, from Basel Active mandates: Volirium AG, LE Leading Edge Holding GmbH Connected persons: Stefan Lanz You can stay up to date through "Jörg Ewald", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jörg Ewald"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jörg Ewald", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jörg Ewald"
|
Places where people with the name Jörg Ewald live
Sectors in which people with the name Jörg Ewald work
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Operation of other financial institutions
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Jörg Ewald
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jörg Ewald
Publication number: HR02-1004532047, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
AirToken GmbH, bisher in Risch, CHE-303.130.706, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2017, Publ. 3843275).
Statutenänderung:
12.12.2018.
Firma neu:
AirToken GmbH in Liquidation.
Sitz neu:
Horw.
Domizil neu:
Hans-Reinhard-Strasse 1, 6048 Horw. Die Gesellschaft hat sich mit Beschluss der ausserordentlichen Gesellschafterversammlung vom 12.12.2018 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ewald, Jörg, von Basel, in Zürich, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2600091, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
LE Leading Edge Holding GmbH, in Ehrendingen, CHE-263.650.860, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2015, Publ. 2011673).
Statutenänderung:
18.12.2015.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Künzli, Ariane, von Bowil, in Reinach (AG), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lanz, Stefan, von Rohrbach, in Ehrendingen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 150 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00];
Ewald, Jörg, von Basel, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 150 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00].
Publication number: 1953647, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Flytec AG, in Horw, CHE-108.060.650, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 18.07.2014, Publ. 1621917).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lanz, Stefan, von Rohrbach, in Ehrendingen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ewald, Jörg, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].