Marc Dörflinger
domiciled in Mörigen, from Basel Active mandates: SFINC.foundation, SFINC.association in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Camilo Rice, Darius Bezan Dinkoo Chenoy, Andreas Amstutz and more You can stay up to date through "Marc Dörflinger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc Dörflinger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marc Dörflinger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc Dörflinger"
|
Places where people with the name Marc Dörflinger live
Sectors in which people with the name Marc Dörflinger work
Religious, political or secular associations
Research and development
Trading with machines
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
IT services
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding public relations
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Religious, political or secular associations
Research and development
Trading with machines
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
IT services
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding public relations
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Private persons with the name Marc Dörflinger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marc Dörflinger
Publication number: HR02-1006102273, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SFINC.foundation, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-401.283.831, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2023, Publ. 1005654887).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dörflinger-Khashman, Nadia, von Basel, in Mörigen, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mayer, Claude-Helene Prof. Dr. Dr., deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Göttingen (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Montada, Leo Prof. Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Konstanz (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörflinger, Marc, von Basel, in Mörigen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005568673, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SFINC.association, in Mörigen, CHE-183.896.582, Verein (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 09.06.2015, S.0, Publ. 2195679).
Name neu:
SFINC.association in Liquidation. Der Verein ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 06.09.2022 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Borner, Barbara, von Rickenbach SO, in Aetigkofen (Buchegg), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörflinger, Marc, von Basel, in Mörigen, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005372099, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Xantia SA, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-112.651.222, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2017, Publ. 3476025).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Loetscher, Jean-Pierre, von Flühli, in Nidau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dörflinger, Marc, von Basel, in Mörigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hofer, Michel, von Frutigen, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Steinmann, Kevin Robert, von Rubigen, in Loveresse, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.