Gianclaudio Campanile
domiciled in Bern, from Bern Active mandates: Noah Vini GmbH, immowerk tu ag and more Connected persons: André Sascha Curti, Bruno Tringaniello, Pia Campanile and more You can stay up to date through "Gianclaudio Campanile", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gianclaudio Campanile"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Gianclaudio Campanile", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gianclaudio Campanile"
|
Places where people with the name Gianclaudio Campanile live
Sectors in which people with the name Gianclaudio Campanile work
Trading in food products
General structural engineering
Services regarding management consulting
Architectural and engineering activities
Trading in food products
General structural engineering
Services regarding management consulting
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Gianclaudio Campanile
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Gianclaudio Campanile
Publication number: HR02-1005112072, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Sareno Immobilien und Management AG, in Baar, CHE-102.370.684, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2020, Publ. 1004973009). Mit Erklärung vom 15.02.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fidra-Treuhand AG (CHE-107.175.374), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Campanile, Gianclaudio, von Bern, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Campanile, Pia, von Bern, in Bern, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004973866, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Cinquecento Vini GmbH, in Fahrni, CHE-433.485.534, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2020, Publ. 1004835708).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sareno Immobilien und Management AG (CHE-102.370.684), in Baar, Gesellschafterin, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Swiss Prime Investment Group AG (CHE-113.854.443), in Baar, Gesellschafterin, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Prasciolu, Luca, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Fahrni b. Thun (Fahrni), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Campanile, Gianclaudio, von Bern, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tringaniello, Bruno, von Belp und Baar, in Baar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3263903, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
immowerk tu ag, in Bern, CHE-112.689.816, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 23.12.2014, Publ. 1897879).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Michetti, Angelo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Herzogenbuchsee, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Campanile, Pia, von Bern, in Bern, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Campanile, Gianclaudio, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Campanile, Patrizia Ornella, von Bern, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Campanile, Stefania Laura, von Bern, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.