Yves Besse
domiciled in Malte, from Lens Active mandates: S.I. Désiré S.A. Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Yves Besse", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Yves Besse"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Yves Besse", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Yves Besse"
|
Places where people with the name Yves Besse live
Sectors in which people with the name Yves Besse work
BranchCode_n/a
BranchCode_n/a
Private persons with the name Yves Besse
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Yves Besse
Publication number: HR02-1005824245, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Liberty, à Sion, CHE-197.698.953, fondation (No. FOSC 51 du 14.03.2022, Publ. 1005426720).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Besse, Yves, de Lens, à Malte (MT), président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Arlettaz-Monnet, Géraldine, de Fully, à Martigny, présidente du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2856399, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Bufidam-Victoria SA, à Lens, CHE-100.480.824, société anonyme (No. FOSC 238 du 08.12.2015, Publ. 2526663).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Besse, Yves, de Lens, à Malte (MT), président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Pannatier, Marie-Jeanne, de Mont-Noble, à Montana, présidente, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Nax, administratrice avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 2803723, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
SI Kabri Crans SA, à Chermignon, CHE-102.992.153, société anonyme (No. FOSC 251 du 30.12.2013, Publ. 1263239).
Modification des statuts:
23.03.2016, 21.04.2016.
Nouveau siège:
Sierre.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Michel Burgener, Avenue Général-Guisan 12, Case postale 100, 3960 Sierre.
Nouvel organe de publication:
FOSC.
Nouvelles communications:
Communication aux actionnaires: par écrit, par fax ou par courriel.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Besse, Yves, de Lens, à Lens, président, avec signature individuelle;
Bufag - Bureau Fiduciaire d'Administration et de Gestion SA (CH-626.3.000.249-0), à Chermignon, organe de révision;
Pannatier, Marie-Jeanne, de Mont-Noble, à Chermignon, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Burgener, Michel, de Viège, à Sierre, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 23.03.2016, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].