Reports for Yildiz Invest Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Yildiz Invest Holding AG
- Yildiz Invest Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Brislach is active. Yildiz Invest Holding AG operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The management has one active person registered.
- On the 19.12.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Yildiz Invest Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.051.074.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.10.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brislach
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.013.472-1
UID/VAT
CHE-112.051.074
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Halten von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen, Finanzierung von solchen Unternehmen sowie Vergabe von Lizenzen. Kann alle Geschäfte eingehen sowie Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Michel Chavanne Revisions AG in Liquidation | Zwingen | 11.07.2006 | 26.02.2009 | |
Peter Haller und Partner Revisions AG in Liquidation | Magden | 28.10.2004 | 10.07.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Yildiz Immobilien Holding AG
- CENASS AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Yildiz Invest Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005631936, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Yildiz Invest Holding AG, in Brislach, CHE-112.051.074, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2021, Publ. 1005290005).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Yildiz, Yavuz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pfeffingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Yildiz, Yusuf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Yildiz, Serif, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005289968, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Yildiz Immobilien Holding AG, in Basel, CHE-112.051.074, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192606). Die Rechtseinheit (neu: Yildiz Invest Holding AG) wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Brislach im Handelsregister des Kantons Basel-Landschaft eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Basel-Stadt von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005290005, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Yildiz Immobilien Holding AG, bisher in Basel, CHE-112.051.074, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192606).
Statutenänderung:
18.08.2021.
Firma neu:
Yildiz Invest Holding AG.
Sitz neu:
Brislach.
Domizil neu:
Zwingenstrasse 67, 4225 Brislach. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.08.2021 wurden die Statuten der Gesellschaft an die Umwandlung angepasst. [bisher: Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Yildiz, Serif, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Itingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Yildiz, Yavuz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pfeffingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Yildiz, Yusuf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.