Reports for Wyler Architekten
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wyler Architekten
- Wyler Architekten has its legal headquarters in Wabern and is active. It operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company Wyler Architekten, which was founded on the 26.08.1980, consists of one person.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.06.2012, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.861.836.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.08.1980
Legal form
Sole proprietorship
Legal headquarters of the company
Köniz
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.1.004.531-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.861.836
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Architekturbüro; Bauberatungen, Verkehrswertgutachten, Projektmanagement.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wyler Architekten
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6715668, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wyler Architekten, in Köniz, CH-035.1.004.531-3, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 21.11.1990, S. 4641).
Zweck neu:
Architekturbüro;
Bauberatungen, Verkehrswertgutachten, Projektmanagement.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Moser, Roger, von Arni BE, in Niederscherli (Köniz), mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyler, Stefan, von Grindelwald, in Wabern (Köniz), Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bern].
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Martin Högger, in Unterengstringen , Handel mit Werbeträgern (Display) und Werbung mit dienlichen Gütern (SHAB Nr.182 vom 19.9.1989, S.3849).
Neuer Wortlaut der Firma:
Info- Punkt Martin Högger.
Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Architekturbüro Stefan Wyler, bisher in Bern (SHAB Nr.199 vom 26.8.1980, S.2846).
Neue Firma:
Wyler Architekten. Der Sitz wurde nach Wabern, Gemeinde Köniz verlegt.
Domizil:
Nesslerenholzweg 7. Einzelprokura führt neu Roger Moser, von Arni, in Niederscherli-Köniz.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.