Address
c/o Kurt Wyler
Libellenweg 7
3645 Gwatt (Thun)
Reports for Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung
- Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Gwatt (Thun). Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 8 persons. The organization was founded on 11.12.2007.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 30.06.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the organization Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung is registered under the UID CHE-113.977.330.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Priska Hofer,
Beat Bütikofer,
Dr. Paul Mäder,
Ernst Rothenfluh,
Melanie Bürki
newest authorized signatories
Priska Hofer,
Beat Bütikofer,
Dr. Paul Mäder,
Ernst Rothenfluh,
Melanie Bürki
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2007
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.7.040.795-4
UID/VAT
CHE-113.977.330
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung kann ausschliesslich Leistungen an gemeinnützige Institutionen auf kommunaler, regionaler, kantonaler, nationaler oder internationaler Ebene ausrichten oder einzelne gemeinnützige Projekte beziehungsweise Werke unterstützen. Im Zentrum der Zielsetzungen der Stiftung liegt die Unterstützung von gemeinnützigen Institutionen in folgenden Bereichen: Gemeinnützige Institutionen mit der Zielsetzung der Gesundheitsförderung in der Dritten Welt; Gemeinnützige Institutionen mit der Zielsetzung der Linderung der wirtschaftlichen Not der Strassenkinder in der Dritten Welt, insbesondere in Südamerika; Gemeinnützige Institutionen mit der Zielsetzung der Ausbildungsförderung von Menschen in der Dritten Welt.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HST Treuhand AG | Thierachern | 30.06.2021 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WISTAG Revision AG | Thun | 31.05.2019 | 29.06.2021 | |
Firest GmbH | Sigriswil | 14.07.2016 | 30.05.2019 | |
LMK Revisions AG | Langenthal | 17.12.2007 | 13.07.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005233472, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung, in Thun, CHE-113.977.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2019, Publ. 1004764669).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WISTAG Revision AG (CHE-104.019.565), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyler, Kurt, von Linden, in Gwatt (Thun), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wyler-Andersson, Anita, von Linden, in Gwatt (Thun), Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
HST Treuhand AG (CHE-103.337.991), in Thierachern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004764669, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung, in Thun, CHE-113.977.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 31.05.2019, Publ. 1004641568).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hofer, Priska, von Langnau im Emmental, in Schwarzenburg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004641568, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wyler-Andersson-Stiftung, in Thun, CHE-113.977.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2017, Publ. 3312959).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Firest GmbH (CHE-109.579.647), in Gunten (Sigriswil), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
WISTAG Revision AG (CHE-104.019.565), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.