Reports for Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern
- Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The organization was founded on 24.07.1974 and has 5 persons in its management.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 05.08.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern is registered under the UID CHE-103.993.936.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Senid Filekovic,
Alexandra Glatzfelder-Lampart,
Remo Silvano Bollinger,
Nadine Baumgartner,
Martin Durrer
newest authorized signatories
Senid Filekovic,
Alexandra Glatzfelder-Lampart,
Remo Silvano Bollinger,
Nadine Baumgartner,
Martin Durrer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.07.1974
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.5.008.389-8
UID/VAT
CHE-103.993.936
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verschaffung und Erhaltung von gesundem und preisgünstigem Wohnraum für ihre Mitglieder in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe und Mitverantwortung; Anbietung von Wohnraum für alle Bevölkerungskreise, insbesondere für Familien; Förderung des Zusammenlebens im Sinne gesamtgesellschaftlicher Verantwortung und gegenseitiger Solidarität; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trevus AG | Sursee | 15.06.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Revisions AG | Sursee | 03.07.2008 | 14.06.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- WBGL Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006099703, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-103.993.936, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2023, Publ. 1005873824).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gabriel, Roland, von Emmen, in Emmen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder der Vizepräsidentin.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Filekovic, Senid, von Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005873824, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-103.993.936, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 05.08.2021, Publ. 1005265144).
Domizil neu:
Udelbodenstrasse 64, 6014 Luzern.
Publication number: HR02-1005265144, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Wohnbaugenossenschaft SBB-Personal Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-103.993.936, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 17.12.2020, Publ. 1005050217).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Böbner, Josef, von Entlebuch, in Entlebuch, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit dem Präsidenten;
Steger, Susanne, von Ettiswil, in Kriens, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Glatzfelder-Lampart, Alexandra, von Buchrain, in Emmen, Vizepräsidentin und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit dem Präsidenten [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Durrer, Martin, von Dallenwil, in Kriens, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit der Vizepräsidentin [bisher: Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit dem Vizepräsidenten];
Baumgartner, Nadine, von Disentis/Mustér, in Risch, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder der Vizepräsidentin [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bollinger, Remo, von Beringen, in Luzern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder der Vizepräsidentin;
Gabriel, Roland, von Emmen, in Emmen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder der Vizepräsidentin [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.