Address
Rue du Grenier 18
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds
Reports for Whyness Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Whyness Holding SA
- Whyness Holding SA has its legal headquarters in La Chaux-de-Fonds, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 17.01.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-401.242.447.
- Companies with an identical address: Aucera SA, Fondation Estelle Mechler, Fonds de prévoyance en faveur du personnel de Infosuisse Information Horlogère et Industrielle.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
La Chaux-de-Fonds
Commercial Registry Office
NE
Commercial register number
CH-645.4.125.702-5
UID/VAT
CHE-401.242.447
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
En Suisse et à l'étranger, acquisition, vente, détention, administration et gestion de participations dans tous types de sociétés et entreprises, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale du 16 décembre 1983 sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Whyness Holding Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Whyness Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005937122, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Whyness Holding SA, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-401.242.447 (FOSC du 14.12.2022, p. 0/1005628555). La procuration de Vega Martinez Antonio est radiée. Girardin Célien Yves-Alain, signe désormais par procuration individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1005628555, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Whyness Holding SA (Whyness Holding Ltd), à La Chaux-de-Fonds, rue du Grenier 18, 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds, CHE-401.242.447. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 06.12.2022.
But:
en Suisse et à l'étranger, acquisition, vente, détention, administration et gestion de participations dans tous types de sociétés et entreprises, à l'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la Loi fédérale du 16 décembre 1983 sur l'acquisition d'immeubles par des personnes à l'étranger (LFAIE).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 1'000 actions de CHF 100, nominatives.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier, courrier électronique ou télécopie si tous les actionnaires sont connus, sinon par avis dans la Feuille officielle suisse du commerce. Benoit Yann, de La Sagne, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, est administrateur unique avec signature individuelle. Procuration collective à deux de Girardin Célien Yves-Alain, de Muriaux, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, et Vega Martinez Antonio, d'Espagne, à La Ferrière. Selon déclaration du 06.12.2022, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et a renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.