Reports for Wegmüller Optik AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Wegmüller Optik AG
- Wegmüller Optik AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Huttwil. Wegmüller Optik AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- Wegmüller Optik AG was founded on 20.08.1997.
- On the 10.07.2015 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-108.657.859.
- Next to the company Wegmüller Optik AG there are 7 other active companies with an identical address. These include: aisoft, Anliker Industrie Software, Andy's-Gym, Inhaber Beat Vonmoos, AVWF Schweiz GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.08.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Huttwil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.007.839-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.657.859
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Optikfachgeschäftes mit Brillen und Kontaktlinsen einschliesslich deren Anpassung, Vornahme von Brillenglasbestimmungen und Erbringen jeglicher Dienstleistung in der Augenoptik sowie Handel mit optischen und optoelektronischen Artikeln. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben, veräussern, belasten, überbauen, verwalten, vermieten und vermitteln. Ein allfälliger Nebenzweck ist aus den Statuten ersichtlich.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Langenthal | 10.07.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
LMK Revisions AG | Langenthal | 16.10.2006 | 09.07.2015 | |
HTO Treuhand AG | Olten | <2004 | 15.10.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Wegmüller Optik AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2262301, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wegmüller Optik AG, in Huttwil, CHE-108.657.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 08.05.2015, Publ. 2142651).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
LMK Revisions AG (CHE-102.604.764), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-408.158.150), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2142651, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wegmüller Optik AG, in Huttwil, CHE-108.657.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2007, S. 3, Publ. 3804016).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
LMK Revisions AG (CHE-102.604.764), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: LMK Revisions AG].
Publication number: 3804016, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Wegmüller Optik AG, in Huttwil, CH-053.3.007.839-8, Betrieb eines Optikfachgeschäftes mit Brillen und Kontaktlinsen einschliesslich deren Anpassung, Vornahme von Brillenglasbestimmungen und Erbringen jeglicher Dienstleistung in der Augenoptik usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2007, S. 4, Publ. 3716738).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Richter, Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zofingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Beer, Martin, von Trub, in Sursee, einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.