Reports for Villvert SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Villvert SA
- Villvert SA is currently active and the industry «General structural engineering». The legal headquarters are in Bussigny.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 27.01.1994.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-107.562.305.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Chef Gourmet Distribution SA, DOMA Immobilier SA, RLS Holding SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bussigny
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.160.100-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.562.305
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Réalisation de villas à ossature en bois et exploitation d'une entreprise générale de construction.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GF Audit SA | Blonay - Saint-Légier | 07.08.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Fidam révision SA | Renens (VD) | 23.04.2012 | 06.08.2018 | |
COMPTA-FISC SYNERGIE Sàrl | Lausanne | 04.10.2010 | 22.04.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Villvert S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Villvert SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006081076, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Villvert SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-107.562.305 (FOSC du 26.07.2019, p. 0/1004685501). Statuts modifiés le 20.06.2024. Siège transféré à Bussigny.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de Mochettaz 7, 1030 Bussigny.
Nouvelles formes des communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier électronique ou par courrier recommandé.
Publication number: HR02-1004685501, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Villvert S.A., à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-107.562.305 (FOSC du 07.08.2018, p. 0/4401705). Statuts modifiés le 10 juillet 2019.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Villvert SA. Le capital-actions de CHF 147'000, libéré à concurrence de CHF 147'000, est désormais divisé en 100 actions nominatives de CHF 100, privilégiées quant au droit de vote et au dividende, et en 137 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, toutes avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Publication number: 4401705, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Villvert S.A., à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-107.562.305 (FOSC du 10.09.2014, p. 0/1707859). BfB Fidam révision SA (CH-550-0096433-4) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
GF Audit SA (CHE-102.246.653), à Blonay. Schnepp Roland est maintenant de Lausanne.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.