Address
Alte Obfelderstrasse 55
8910 Affoltern am Albis
Reports for Viatop AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Viatop AG
- Viatop AG with its legal headquarters in Affoltern am Albis is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Various industrial production». Viatop AG is active.
- Viatop AG has 5 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-115.403.181.
- The address is identical with 6 other active companies. These include: a3 Betonpumpen AG, AGIR Umwelt AG, Axirion Management AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Diego Vonplon,
Michael Hofherr,
Hans-Martin Meyer,
Marino Crescionini Jun.,
Rudolf Vonplon
newest authorized signatories
Diego Vonplon,
Michael Hofherr,
Hans-Martin Meyer,
Marino Crescionini Jun.,
Rudolf Vonplon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.02.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Affoltern am Albis
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.034.779-5
UID/VAT
CHE-115.403.181
Sector
Various industrial production
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb von Belagswerken. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen der Strassenbau- und Belagsbranche beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dascon AG | Eschenbach (SG) | 07.07.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Affoltern am Albis | 09.02.2010 | 06.07.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Viatop AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006090050, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Viatop AG, in Affoltern am Albis, CHE-115.403.181, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 01.09.2023, Publ. 1005828479).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Turrin, Felix Silvio Benno, von Zürich, in Regensdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005828479, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Viatop AG, in Affoltern am Albis, CHE-115.403.181, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 19.08.2022, Publ. 1005543746).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Greber, Dieter, von Affoltern am Albis, in Affoltern am Albis, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vonplon, Diego, von Vilters-Wangs, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hofherr, Michael, von Lauterbrunnen, in Muri (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005543746, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Viatop AG, in Affoltern am Albis, CHE-115.403.181, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 04.05.2020, Publ. 1004881881).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stalder, Roman Josef, von Malters, in Muri AG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Turrin, Felix Silvio Benno, von Zürich, in Regensdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.