Reports for Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen
- Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is an Association and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has one active person registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.05.2021.
- Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-102.867.393.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.04.1996
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.6.000.264-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.867.393
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vereinigung von namhaften Unternehmen in der Schweiz, welche Produkte und Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Sicherheit anbieten; durch aktives Zusammenwirken aller Vereinsorgane Erbringung von nutzbringenden Leistungen für die Mitglieder und für die Öffentlichkeit wie Durchführung von Messeaktivitäten und Veranstaltungen, Durchführung von Gemeinschaftswerbung und Aktivierung des Sicherheitsbewusstseins der Bevölkerung.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005191949, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen, in Zürich, CHE-102.867.393, Verein (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 30.06.2020, Publ. 1004923660).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eichholzer, Martin-Jakob, von Zürich und Langnau am Albis, in Aesch b. Birmensdorf, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frick, Hans, von Maschwanden und Zürich, in Uitikon Waldegg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wagner, Anton, von Läufelfingen, in Uezwil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004923660, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen, in Zürich, CHE-102.867.393, Verein (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 07.06.2007, S.25, Publ. 3964374).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fehlmann, Monika, von Zürich und Heiligenschwendi, in Wettswil am Albis, Mitglied des Vorstandes, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3964374, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Verein für Sicherheits-Informationen, in Zürich, CH-020.6.000.264-4, Vereinigung von namhaften Unternehmen in der Schweiz, welche Produkte und Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Sicherheit anbieten, Verein (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2004, S. 19, Publ. 2466332).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Waldis, Hans, von Weggis und Zürich, in Niederhasli, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.