Address
Pfäffikonerstrasse 15
8834 Schindellegi
Reports for VENOR Capital GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout VENOR Capital GmbH
- VENOR Capital GmbH is active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Schindellegi.
- The management of the company VENOR Capital GmbH consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.06.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company VENOR Capital GmbH is the following: CHE-427.201.757.
- akribes AG, Axello AG, Hartmann Consultancy Solutions have the same address as VENOR Capital GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.2020
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Feusisberg
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.028.503-5
UID/VAT
CHE-427.201.757
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen der Unternehmensberatung in jeglichen Bereichen für Gesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche übernehmen und errichten sowie alle Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet sind, ihren Zweck direkt oder indirekt zu fördern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: VENOR Capital GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006049555, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
VENOR Capital GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-427.201.757, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2020, Publ. 1005034557).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Salihovic, Abedin, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Regensdorf, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005034557, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
VENOR Capital GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-427.201.757, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 14.09.2020, Publ. 1004977825).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Jean-Marc, von Flawil, in Männedorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rhyner, Luca, von Glarus, in Feusisberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1004977825, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
VENOR Capital GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-427.201.757, Pfäffikonerstrasse 15, 8834 Schindellegi, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
08.09.2020.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen der Unternehmensberatung in jeglichen Bereichen für Gesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche übernehmen und errichten sowie alle Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet sind, ihren Zweck direkt oder indirekt zu fördern. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 08.09.2020 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
VENOR Holding AG (CHE-157.429.571), in Feusisberg, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Baumann, Jean-Marc, von Flawil, in Männedorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.