Reports for Vendor AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Vendor AG
- Vendor AG in Cham is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». Vendor AG is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.06.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Vendor AG is the following: CHE-103.342.118.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Capital-Sigma Cham AG, DOFRAG AG, W. J. Versicherungs- und Vermögensberatungs AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.009.903-7
UID/VAT
CHE-103.342.118
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Handel mit Holz- und Papierwaren, Chemikalien und ähnlichen Produkten sowie medizinischen und elektrotechnischen Geräten, Führen von Agenturen und Vertretungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Industrie- und Handelsunternehmungen auf dem Gebiet von Holz- und Papierwaren, Chemikalien, Medizinaltechnik und Ausrüstungen beteiligen; sie kann Finanzgeschäfte aller Art tätigen sowie im In- und Ausland Immobilien erwerben, verkaufen und verwalten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Vendor Ltd
- Vendor SA
- Vendor Cham AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Vendor AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005205109, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Vendor AG, in Cham, CHE-103.342.118, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2020, Publ. 1004982390).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Businger, Franz, von Stans, in Cham, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Businger, Patrick B., von Stans, in Cham, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004982390, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Vendor AG, in Cham, CHE-103.342.118, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2017, Publ. 3617457).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Businger, Patrick B., von Stans, in Cham, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3617457, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Vendor AG, bisher in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-103.342.118, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 14.11.2008, Publ. 4733704).
Statutenänderung:
20.06.2017.
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
St. Jakobstrasse 60, 6330 Cham.
Aktien neu:
10'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 30.00 [bisher: 10'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 30.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Businger, Franz, von Stans, in Cham, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Businger, Dominik, von Stans, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.