Reports for UnRiskOmega AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout UnRiskOmega AG
- UnRiskOmega AG has its legal headquarters in Kloten and is active. It operates in the sector «IT services».
- UnRiskOmega AG was founded on 13.10.2016.
- On the 19.01.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-154.039.423.
- Companies with an identical address: Glasschain AG, HedgeQuant Holding GmbH, Multilateral AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Matthias Raphael Gysi,
Rolf Grob,
Marc Fabian Aeberhard,
Dr. Michael Aichinger,
Edgar René Gut
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.10.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kloten
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.043.845-1
UID/VAT
CHE-154.039.423
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen der elektronischen Datenverarbeitung und -bereitstellung, die Entwicklung und den Vertrieb von Soft- und Hardware, den Betrieb und das Hosting von Software und Informationsdienstleistungen im eigenen Namen und für Dritte, die Beratung von Dritten bezüglich der Entwicklung, Evaluation, Betrieb von Soft- und Hardware sowie das Unternehmen von allen Tätigkeiten welche damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: UnRiskOmega AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005656030, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
UnRiskOmega AG, in Kloten, CHE-154.039.423, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 146 vom 31.07.2019, Publ. 1004687668).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Binder, Dr. Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Linz (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gysi, Matthias Raphael, von Kloten, in Volketswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004687668, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
UnRiskOmega AG, in Kloten, CHE-154.039.423, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 18.11.2016, S.0, Publ. 3170105).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grob, Rolf, von Knonau, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Aeberhard, Marc, von Zuzwil (BE), in Bassersdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: 3170105, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
UnRiskOmega AG, in Kloten, CHE-154.039.423, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2016, Publ. 3114167).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binder, Dr. Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Linz (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Aichinger, Dr. Michael, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Perg (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Aeberhard, Marc, von Zuzwil BE, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Gut, Edgar, von Wettingen, in Würenlos, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.