Reports for Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG
- Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Zürich. Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 29.09.1982 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 26.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.042.764.
- On the same address as Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: TeaDea AG, THOMAS UND DORIS AMMANN STIFTUNG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.09.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.901.281-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.042.764
CHE-422.340.908 VAT
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit, den Import, Export und die Vermittlung von Kunstgegenständen aller Art insbesondere Bilder, Skulpturen, Zeichnungen etc. sowie die damit zusammenhängenden Kommissionsgeschäfte. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im ln- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen auf eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Haussmann Revision AG | Zürich | 17.07.2014 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
treuhand ag pfäffikon | Freienbach | 02.05.2006 | 16.07.2014 | |
Ostschweizerische Treuhand-Gesellschaft AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 01.05.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Thomas Ammann Fine Art Ltd
- Thomas Ammann Fine Art SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006113685, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.042.764, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 25.07.2024, Publ. 1006093500).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mahler, Eva, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Bernhard, von Sarmenstorf, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006093500, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.042.764, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2023, Publ. 1005725890).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Falck, Michael, von Luzern, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005725890, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Thomas Ammann Fine Art AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.042.764, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2022, Publ. 1005407753).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frei, Jürg, von Pfaffnau, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.