Reports for Theodor Rietschi AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Theodor Rietschi AG
- Theodor Rietschi AG with its legal headquarters in Arlesheim is active. Theodor Rietschi AG operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 20.12.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Theodor Rietschi AG is registered in the Canton of BL under the UID CHE-102.372.051.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Ausländische Biere AG, Econet Trading Ltd, Hahn-Rickli AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Markus Rietschi,
Marcel Rietschi,
Silvia Rietschi Jenny,
Remo Jenny
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Alain Jenny,
Jonathan Neil Southworth,
Markus Rietschi,
Marcel Rietschi,
Silvia Rietschi Jenny
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.02.1926
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.004.873-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.372.051
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist Handel mit Mineralwassern, Weinen, Bier und Kolonialwaren. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmen ähnlicher Art beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BANDO TREUHAND AG | Basel | 08.08.2014 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Leo Herzig | Muttenz | 07.04.2011 | 07.08.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Theodor Rietschi AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005361625, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Theodor Rietschi AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.372.051, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2014, S.0, Publ. 1654583).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jenny, Alain, von Basel, in Riehen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Southworth, Jonathan Neil, von Oberuzwil, in Birmenstorf (AG), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1654583, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Theodor Rietschi AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.372.051, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 03.04.2014, Publ. 1433685).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rietschi, Kurt, von Basel, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rietschi, Rita, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leo Herzig (CHE-106.121.915), in Muttenz, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rietschi, Markus, von Basel, in Binningen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rietschi Jenny, Silvia, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien aber nicht mit Remo Jenny;
Rietschi, Marcel, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BANDO TREUHAND AG (CHE-109.402.055), in Ettingen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1433685, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Theodor Rietschi AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.372.051, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 07.04.2011, Publ. 6111514).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leo Herzig (106.121.915), in Muttenz, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Leo Herzig (CH-270.1.015.323-8), in Basel].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.