Reports for Hahn-Rickli AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hahn-Rickli AG
- Hahn-Rickli AG in Arlesheim is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading in food products». Hahn-Rickli AG is active.
- The company was founded on 08.04.1969.
- The last commercial register change was made on 20.12.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Hahn-Rickli AG is the following: CHE-102.508.155.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Ausländische Biere AG, Econet Trading Ltd, Rigeba AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Markus Rietschi,
Marcel Rietschi,
Yvonne Brönnimann-Rietschi,
Remo Jenny
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Alain Jenny,
Jonathan Neil Southworth,
Markus Rietschi,
Marcel Rietschi,
Yvonne Brönnimann-Rietschi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.04.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.002.847-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.508.155
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Spirituosen und Weinen und anderen alkoholischen und alkoholfreien Getränken engros und im Einzelverkauf, ferner Fabrikation und Import von Weinen sowie Betrieb einer Weinkellerei. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmungen beteiligen, solche erwerben oder errichten, Liegenschaften kaufen und verkaufen sowie gewerbliche Schutzrechte und Know-how erwerben und verwerten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BANDO TREUHAND AG | Basel | 08.08.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- H. Hahn-Rickli AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hahn-Rickli AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005361609, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hahn-Rickli AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.508.155, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2014, S.0, Publ. 1654551).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jenny, Alain, von Basel, in Riehen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Southworth, Jonathan Neil, von Oberuzwil, in Birmenstorf (AG), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1654551, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hahn-Rickli AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-102.508.155, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2002, S. 4).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rietschi, Kurt, von Basel, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rietschi, Rita, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Herzig, Leo, von Obersteckholz, in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rietschi, Markus, von Basel, in Binningen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Brönnimann, Yvonne, von Wald BE, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rietschi, Marcel, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BANDO TREUHAND AG (CHE-109.402.055), in Ettingen, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
H. Hahn-Rickli AG, in Basel, Spirituosen usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2002, S. 7, Publ. 535374).
Löschungsgrund:
Firma, nun firmierend 'Hahn-Rickli AG', infolge Sitzverlegung der Gesellschaft nach Arlesheim (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2002, S. 4) im Handelsregister Basel-Stadt von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.