Reports for Theler Goler AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Theler Goler AG
- Theler Goler AG in Raron is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Waste collection, treatment and disposal». Theler Goler AG is active.
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 12.08.2019.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-110.117.029.
- On the same address there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: Agrifenum GmbH, CRB Theler Holding AG, Mosito AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Renzo Theler,
Bernd Theler,
Max Ulrich Theler,
Carole Marie Meile-Theler
newest authorized signatories
Renzo Theler,
Bernd Theler,
Max Ulrich Theler,
Carole Marie Meile-Theler,
Boris Albin Wyssen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Raron
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.011.700-4
UID/VAT
CHE-110.117.029
CHE-498.606.027 VAT
Sector
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verrichtung von Bau- und Dienstleistungen aller Art. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zenhäusern Treuhand AG | Visp | 07.07.2003 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Theler Goler AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004694315, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Theler Goler AG, in Raron, CHE-110.117.029, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1757801).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 5, 3942 Raron.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Theler, Monika, von Raron und Ausserberg, in Raron, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Theler, Renzo, von Raron, in Raron, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Ausserberg, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Theler, Bernd, von Raron, in Raron, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Theler, Max Ulrich, von Raron, in Raron, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Theler, Max, von Ausserberg, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1757801, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Theler Goler AG, in Raron, CHE-110.117.029, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2012, Publ. 6770844).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 28, 3942 Raron.
Publication number: 6770844, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Theler Goler AG, in Raron, CH-600.3.011.700-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 30.03.2007, S. 18, Publ. 3864518).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Theler, Max, von Ausserberg, in Raron, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Meile-Theler, Carole, von Ausserberg und Fischingen, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Theler, Renzo, von Ausserberg, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.